EP0885387 - HEAT FLOW METER INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holometrix, Inc. 25 Wiggins Avenue Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [1998/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL-HUSAYNI, Hani, A. 1170 Wilson Road No. 51 Fall River, MA 02720 / US | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Gallileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97914901.0 | 07.03.1997 | [1998/52] | WO1997US03583 | Priority number, date | US19960612581 | 08.03.1996 Original published format: US 612581 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733161 | Date: | 12.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885387 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/18 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
G01N25/18 (EP,US);
G01N25/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/52] | Title | German: | WÄRMEFLUSSMESSGERÄTE | [1998/52] | English: | HEAT FLOW METER INSTRUMENTS | [1998/52] | French: | INSTRUMENTS DE MESURE D'UN FLUX THERMIQUE | [1998/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1997 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/06] | 07.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/06] | Appeal following examination | 18.12.1998 | Appeal received No. J0024/99 | 27.05.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.03.2000 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2000/14] | 20.06.2000 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2000/26] | 22.03.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3733887 (STANLEY M, et al) [X] 1-3,18,35 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 15; figure - *; | [X]JPS63290949 (NIPPON INTER ELECTRONICS CORP) [X] 1-3,14,18,35,36 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS57151846 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821214), vol. 006, no. 255, Database accession no. (P - 162), & JP57151846 A 19820920 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1,3,6,7,9,14 * abstract * |