EP0888313 - 2,3-BENZODIAZEPINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS AMPA-RECEPTOR INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 170/178 13353 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Müllerstrasse 170/178 13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LING, István Almos vezér utja 44 H-1141 Budapest / HU | 02 /
ABRAHAM, Gizella Haraszt u. 5 H-1118 Budapest / HU | 03 /
SOLYOM, Sándor Füredi park 7 H-1144 Budapest / HU | 04 /
HAMORI, Tamás Amfiteátrum ut 27 H-1031 Budapest / HU | 05 /
TARNAWA, István Kerékgyárt(RTM) u. 45 c H-1147 Budapest / HU | 06 /
BERZSENYI, Pál Bulyovszky u. 12 H-1174 Budapest / HU | 07 /
ANDRASI, Ferenc Kutvölgyi ut 69 H-1125 Budapest / HU | 08 /
CSUZDI, Emese Lahner Gy u. 2/4 H-1046 Budapest / HU | 09 /
SZÖLLOSY, Márta Kápolna u. 3 H-1105 Budapest / HU | 10 /
SIMAY, Antal Pagony u. 30 H-1124 Budapest / HU | 11 /
PALLAGI, István Nyirpalota ut 59 H-1157 Budapest / HU | 12 /
HORVATH, Katalin Nagybányai ut 54 b H-1025 Budapest / HU | [1999/01] | Application number, filing date | 97915277.4 | 29.01.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997DE00225 | Priority number, date | DE1996104920 | 01.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19604920 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728135 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888313 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888313 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D243/02, A61K31/55 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
C07D243/02 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Title | German: | 2,3-BENZODIAZEPINDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS AMPA-REZEPTOREN-HEMMER | [1999/01] | English: | 2,3-BENZODIAZEPINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS AMPA-RECEPTOR INHIBITORS | [1999/01] | French: | DERIVES DE 2,3-BENZODIAZEPINE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME INHIBITEURS DE RECEPTEURS D'AMPA | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 08.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2034706 (EGYT GYOGYSZERVEGYESZETI GYAR) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4423044 (KOROESI JENO [HU], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column W *; | [Y]GB2162184 (EGYT GYOGYSZERVEGYESZETI GYAR) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0512419 (EGYT GYOGYSZERVEGYESZETI GYAR [HU]) [X] 1,4 * siehe Seite 5, Verbindung IV *; | [Y] - G. DE SARRO ET AL., "GYKI 52466 and related 2,3-benzodiazepines as anticonvulsant agents in DBA/2 mice", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, AMSTERDAM NL, (1995), vol. 294, pages 411 - 22, XP002034232 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(95)00561-7 |