EP0910965 - PROCESS FOR ADHESIVE BONDING THE SOLE TO THE CUT PART IN THE SHOE MAKING INDUSTRY, AND LEATHER MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASOCIACION DE INVESTIGACION PARA LA INDUSTRIA DEL CALZADO Y CONEXAS ( INESCOP) Poligono Industrial Campo Alto S/N E-03600 Elda (Alicante) / ES | [1999/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALDONADO MILLAN, Fernando Bahia Pinos, 2F-1E E-03540 Playa S. Juan / ES | 02 /
ALMELA ALARCON, Mariano Mariano Luina, 15-4 1 E-03201 Elche / ES | 03 /
ESCOTO PALACIOS, Maria José Maestro Gaztambide, 27 E-03004 Alicante / ES | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas Edificio Aqua, Calle Agustín de Foxá 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | De Arpe Fernandez, Manuel ARPE Patentes y Marcas Guzmán El Bueno, 133 28003 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 97915491.1 | 02.04.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997ES00084 | Priority number, date | ES19960000792 | 03.04.1996 Original published format: ES 9600792 | ES19970000669 | 01.04.1997 Original published format: ES 9700669 | [1999/17] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737555 | Date: | 16.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910965 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 16.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A43B9/12, A43B13/32, A43D25/20, C09J7/02 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
A43D25/20 (EP);
A43B13/32 (EP);
A43B9/12 (EP);
C09J7/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, PT [1999/17] | Title | German: | INDUSTRIELLES VERFAHREN ZUM ANKLEBEN DER SOHLE AM SCHUH,SOWIE LEDERWAREN | [1999/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR ADHESIVE BONDING THE SOLE TO THE CUT PART IN THE SHOE MAKING INDUSTRY, AND LEATHER MATERIALS | [1999/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE FIXATION PAR COLLAGE D'UNE SEMELLE A LA PARTIE DECOUPEE D'UNE CHAUSSURE, ET DE MATERIAUX DE MAROQUINERIE | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1998 | Translation filed | 29.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 17.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/18] | 25.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]ES2033240 (BOSTIK) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 6 - line 36; claims 1,2,6,8,9 * [A] 3-24; | [A]ES2041349 (USM ESPANA); | [XA]US3483582 (MORGAN PAUL E) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 36 - line 48 * * column 4, line 5 - line 44; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-24; | [A]US3951919 (PINFOLD RAYMOND N F, et al); | [XA]ES441194 (VOGELS K G H [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 1 - line 8; claim - * [A] 3-24; | [A]ES8502608 (BOSTIK SA [FR]); | [A]EP0381897 (BOSTIK LTD [GB], et al) |