EP0890273 - CHARGING SYSTEMS FOR SERVICES IN COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMYTH, Peter, Paul The Old Piggery, Newbourne Woodridge, Suffolk IP12 4NP / GB | 02 /
MCKEE, Paul, Francis 2 Celandine Court, Braiswick Colchester, Essex CO4 5UQ / GB | 03 /
DOYLE, Katherine, Emma 2 Farrows Close, Chevington Bury St. Edmunds, Suffolk IP29 5QJ / GB | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A. BT Centre 81 Newgate Street, London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A. BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/12] | Evershed, Michael, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PPC5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/02] | Evershed, Michael, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97915573.6 | 01.04.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997GB00923 | Priority number, date | EP19960302237 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: EP 96302237 | GB19960019897 | 24.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9619897 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737503 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890273 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890273 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22, H04M15/00 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/58 (EP,US);
H04M15/8083 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0184 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0188 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/02] | Title | German: | GEBÜHRENSYSTEME FÜR KOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTE | [1999/02] | English: | CHARGING SYSTEMS FOR SERVICES IN COMMUNICATIONS | [1999/02] | French: | SYSTEMES DE TAXATION DE SERVICES DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.03.2004 | CH | 17.03.2004 | FI | 17.03.2004 | LI | 17.03.2004 | NL | 17.03.2004 | DK | 17.06.2004 | SE | 17.06.2004 | PT | 17.08.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/13] | BE | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | BE | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | BE | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | CH | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
SE | 17.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0526118 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * column 2, line 34 - line 38 * * column 3, line 5 - line 30 * * column 6, line 23 - column 8, line 10 * * column 9, line 23 - line 52 * [Y] 3,4,6,9; | [XY]GB2272607 (VODAFONE LTD [GB]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 3 * * page 4, line 5 - line 8 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 1 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 25 * [Y] 3,4,6,9; | [A]WO9428683 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1,2,5,7,9 * page 2, line 4 - line 22 * * page 7, line 1 - line 9 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 1 * * page 8, line 18 - line 24 * * page 30, line 34 - page 31, line 2 * * page 31, line 23 - line 31 *; | [X]WO9530317 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,9 * page 1, line 15 - line 20 * * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 5 * * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 7 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 22 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 32 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 13 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 3 * * page 14, line 10 - line 33 *; | [A]US5488655 (HAMLEN GLEN A [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 5 ** column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 25; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US5497504 (ACAMPORA ANTHONY S [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,6,9 * column 2, line 40 - line 63 * * column 3, line 37 - line 48 * * column 5, line 30 - line 37 * * column 6, line 19 - line 44 * * column 7, line 2 - line 15 * |