EP0835595 - PROCESS OF ACCESS RESTRICTION TO A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK, TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM AND UNIT FOR SUCH A SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUCHER, Pierre-Hugues Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97915640.3 | 21.04.1997 | [1998/16] | WO1997IB00419 | Priority number, date | FR19960005363 | 29.04.1996 Original published format: FR 9605363 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741707 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835595 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUGRIFFSBESCHRÄNKUNG FÜR TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ, TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND EINHEIT DAFÜR | [1998/16] | English: | PROCESS OF ACCESS RESTRICTION TO A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK, TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM AND UNIT FOR SUCH A SYSTEM | [1998/16] | French: | PROCEDE VISANT A RESTREINDRE L'ACCES A UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS, SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS ET UNITE DESTINEE A CELUI-CI | [1998/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 27.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9600485 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 24 - page 15, line 35 *; | [A]FR2716319 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0463384 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [A]WO9303585 (TELSTRA CORP LTD [AU]) [A] 1,6,9 * page 1, line 25 - page 3, line 30 * | [A] - WALKER M, "SECURITY IN MOBILE AND CORDLESS TELECOMMUNICATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS A SOFTWARE ENGINEERING (COMPEURO), THE HAGUE, MAY 4 - 8, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920504), no. CONF. 6, pages 493 - 496, XP000344244 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CMPEUR.1992.218434 |