EP0870397 - OVER-CURRENT PROTECTION CIRCUIT IN LINE DEFLECTION CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENNINGS, James, R. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 97915648.6 | 23.04.1997 | [1998/42] | WO1997IB00427 | Priority number, date | US19960673996 | 01.07.1996 Original published format: US 673996 | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800967 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0870397 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870397 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/20, H04N5/63, H02H9/04 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
H03K4/085 (EP,US);
H04N3/16 (KR);
H03K17/0826 (EP,US);
H04N3/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/42] | Title | German: | ÜBERSTROMSCHUTZSCHALTUNG FÜR EINE ZEILENABLENKSCHALTUNG | [2002/01] | English: | OVER-CURRENT PROTECTION CIRCUIT IN LINE DEFLECTION CIRCUITS | [1998/42] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURINTENSITES DANS DES CIRCUITS DE DEVIATION DE LIGNE | [1998/42] |
Former [1998/42] | ÜBERSTROMSCHUTZSCHALTUNG FÜR ZEILENABLENKUNG | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3916288 (HICKS JAMES E, et al); | [A]US4213166 (WATANABE MASANOBU [JP]); | [A]US4459517 (HICKS JAMES E [US]); | [A]US4595977 (VON DER OHE WILFRIED [DE]); | [X]US4885509 (IKEUCHI HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]WO9110317 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]); | [A]US5119262 (IKEUCHI HIROSHI [JP]) |