EP0948768 - SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING DATA I/O BETWEEN USB INPUT DEVICE AND NON-USB COGNITION APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POISNER, David 313 N. Lexington Folsom, CA 95630 / US | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon LLP 11th Floor, Tower 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 1JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn London WC2A 2AZ / GB | ||
Former [1999/41] | Molyneaux, Martyn William Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97915962.1 | 14.03.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997US04032 | Priority number, date | US19960622471 | 25.03.1996 Original published format: US 622471 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736230 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948768 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0948768 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F11/30, G06F12/02, G06F13/00, H03K17/94, H03M11/00 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
G06F13/105 (EP,US);
G06F13/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/41] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG VON DATENEIN-/AUSGANG ZWISCHEN USB-EINGABEGERÄT UND NICHT-UBS-ERKENNTNISANWENDUNG | [1999/41] | English: | SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING DATA I/O BETWEEN USB INPUT DEVICE AND NON-USB COGNITION APPLICATION | [1999/41] | French: | SYSTEME POUR FACILITER L'E/S DE DONNEES ENTRE UNE UNITE PERIPHERIQUE D'ENTREE USB ET UNE APPLICATION DE COGNITION NON USB | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 21.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YE]US5628029 (EVOY DAVID R [US]); | [YP]US5610601 (LAHTI GREGG D [US], et al); | [YP]US5590312 (MARISETTY SURESH K [US]); | [YP]US5551044 (SHAH NILESH V [US], et al); | [YP]US5509139 (AYASH BASEM A [US], et al); | [A]US5437039 (YUEN DESMOND [US]) |