EP0885524 - APPARATUS FOR SAMPLING AND DISPLAYING AN AUXILIARY IMAGE WITH A MAIN IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10333 North Meridian Street Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10330 North Meridian St Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATTON, Steven, Wayne 7747 South Louthan Street Littleton, CO 80120 / US | 02 /
RUMREICH, Mark, Francis 10308 Indian Lake Boulevard South Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | 03 /
WILLIS, Donald, Henry 5175 East 74th Place Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Licensing & Intellectual Property, Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 97916205.4 | 06.03.1997 | [1998/52] | WO1997US04784 | Priority number, date | GB19960004857 | 07.03.1996 Original published format: GB 9604857 | US19960025532P | 06.09.1996 Original published format: US 25532 P | GB19960022193 | 25.10.1996 Original published format: GB 9622193 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733430 | Date: | 12.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885524 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0885524 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/45 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
H04N5/45 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/52] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM ABTASTEN UND ANZEIGEN EINES UNTERBILDES MIT EINEM HAUPTBILD | [1998/52] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SAMPLING AND DISPLAYING AN AUXILIARY IMAGE WITH A MAIN IMAGE | [1998/52] | French: | APPAREIL POUR L'ECHANTILLONNAGE ET L'AFFICHAGE D'UNE IMAGE AUXILIAIRE CONJOINTEMENT AVEC UNE IMAGE PRINCIPALE | [1998/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0200330 (RCA CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5459528 (PETTITT GREGORY S [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH01117585 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890810), vol. 13, no. 359, Database accession no. (E - 804), & JP01117585 A 19890510 (NEC) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US5067016 |