EP0897333 - WASH DURABLE FABRIC LAMINATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark Delaware 19714-9206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUTTA, Anit 5419 Pinehurst Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97916233.6 | 25.03.1997 | [1999/08] | WO1997US04930 | Priority number, date | US19960633714 | 17.04.1996 Original published format: US 633714 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9738854 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897333 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, B32B7/12, D06N7/00, A41D31/02, D06M23/16 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
B32B7/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B27/40 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B5/024 (US);
B32B5/026 (US);
B32B2307/7242 (US);
B32B2307/7265 (US);
B32B2307/728 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/08] | Title | German: | WASCHFESTE GEWEBELAMINATE | [1999/08] | English: | WASH DURABLE FABRIC LAMINATES | [1999/08] | French: | LAMINES TEXTILES RESISTANT AU LAVAGE | [1999/08] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/24] | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4761324 (RAUTENBERG LEONARD J ET AL) [DX] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 27; claims 1,6 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 26 *; | [A]EP0560630 (MCNEIL PPC INC) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-3,8,9,14-16 *; | [A]GB1283067 (KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION) [A] 1,6 * page 3, line 84 - line 98; figure 2A; claims 1,5,7 * * page 1, line 11 - line 15 *; | [A]DE4003764 (RUITER ERNEST DE ;BLUECHER HASSO VON (DE)) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9311632U (MAYSER GMBH & CO) [A] 1,3,6 * page 4, line 5 - line 10; claims 1-7 * * page 5, line 23 - page 7, line 6 *; | [A]US3870592 (BROCK ROBERT J ET AL) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]GB1590102 (HERCULES INC) [A] 1 * claim - * |