EP1062311 - CONCENTRATED FABRIC SOFTENING COMPOSITION AND HIGHLY UNSATURATED FABRIC SOFTENER COMPOUND THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRINH, Toan 8671 Creekwood Lane Maineville, OH 45039 / US | 02 /
CARR, Eugene, Robert 912 W. Fairmont Drive Peoria, IL 61614 / US | 03 /
TORDIL, Helen, Bernardo 7590 West Chester Road West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 04 /
KEYS, Robert, Otis 1600 Preston Woods Court Columbus, OH 43235 / US | 05 /
MEYER, Laura, Marie 3751 Philnoll Drive Cincinnati, OH 45247 / US | 06 /
WAHL, Errol, Hoffman 8021 Deershadow Lane Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Engisch, Gautier, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 97916253.4 | 25.03.1997 | [2000/52] | WO1997US05097 | Priority number, date | US19960684366 | 19.07.1996 Original published format: US 684366 | US19960735369 | 21.10.1996 Original published format: US 735369 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803619 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062311 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/00, C11D1/62, C11D3/20 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
C11D3/2041 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D3/001 (EP);
C11D3/2044 (EP);
C11D3/2048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | KONZENTRIERTE TEXTILWEICHMACHUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND STARK UNGESÄTTIGTE TEXTILWEICHMACHUNGSVERBINDUNG DAFÜR | [2000/52] | English: | CONCENTRATED FABRIC SOFTENING COMPOSITION AND HIGHLY UNSATURATED FABRIC SOFTENER COMPOUND THEREFOR | [2000/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ASSOUPLISSANTES CONCENTREES, A INDICE DE RECUPERATION ELEVE APRES CONGELATION/DECONGELATION, ET COMPOSE HAUTEMENT INSATURE A BASE D'AGENT D'ASSOUPLISSEMENT ENTRANT DANS CES COMPOSITIONS | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.1999 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 05.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.1999 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | 07.04.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.04.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.05.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0296995 (COTELLE SA [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 6, line 33 - line 36 *; | [A]WO9420597 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [X]EP0634475 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 13, line 1 - line 48 *; | [X]US5399272 (SWARTLEY DONALD M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 62 - column 7, line 31; example - *; | [YD]US5500138 (BACON DENNIS R [US], et al) [YD] 1-10 * column 3, line 1 - column 6, line 8 *; | [PY]WO9703169 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PY] 1-10 * the whole document * |