EP0891670 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A SECURE COMMUNICATION BETWEEN TWO DEVICES AND APPLICATION OF THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irdeto Access B.V. Jupiterstraat 42 2132 HD Hoofddorp / NL | [2000/33] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states Digco B.V. Jupiterstraat 42 2132 HD Hoofddorp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIX, Simon, Paul, Ashley 51 Ixia Road, Primrose Hill Germiston, Transvaal / ZA | 02 /
GLASSPOOL, Andrew Telford Point, Telford Road Basingstoke RG21 2XZ / GB | 03 /
DAVIES, Donald, Watts 15 Hawkewood Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 6HL / GB | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2009/40] |
Former [1999/03] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke De Vries & Metman, Gebouw Autumn, Overschiestraat 184 N 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 97916402.7 | 21.03.1997 | [1999/03] | WO1997EP01557 | Priority number, date | EP19960200907 | 03.04.1996 Original published format: EP 96200907 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9738530 | Date: | 16.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891670 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891670 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0891670 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/167 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
H04N21/4367 (EP,US);
H04L9/0825 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04L2209/60 (EP,US);
H04L9/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GESICHERTEN ÜBERTRAGUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI GERÄTEN UND DESSEN ANWENDUNG | [1999/03] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING A SECURE COMMUNICATION BETWEEN TWO DEVICES AND APPLICATION OF THIS METHOD | [1999/03] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A ETABLIR UNE COMMUNICATION SURE ENTRE DEUX DISPOSITIFS ET MISE EN APPLICATION DU PROCEDE | [1999/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.03.2001
12.04.2001
ADMISSIBLE CANAL + TECHNOLOGIES SOCIETE ANONYME 34 PLACE RAOUL DAUTRY 75516 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR Opponent's representative Weihs, Bruno Konrad Osha Liang 121, Avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.03.2001
12.04.2001
ADMISSIBLE CANAL + TECHNOLOGIES SOCIETE ANONYME 34 PLACE RAOUL DAUTRY 75516 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR Opponent's representative Weihs, Bruno Konrad Osha Liang 32 avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.03.2001
12.04.2001
ADMISSIBLE CANAL + TECHNOLOGIES SOCIETE ANONYME 34 PLACE RAOUL DAUTRY 75516 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR Opponent's representative Weihs, Bruno Rosenthal & Osha, 121, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.03.2001
12.04.2001
ADMISSIBLE CANAL + TECHNOLOGIES SOCIETE ANONYME 34 PLACE RAOUL DAUTRY 75516 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR Opponent's representative Cozens, Paul Dennis Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | 20.04.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.08.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.09.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.06.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.06.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.03.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.03.2003 | Appeal received No. T0419/03 | 23.05.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.06.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 20.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.03.2001 | AT | 21.03.2002 | FI | 21.03.2002 | IE | 21.03.2002 | LU | 21.03.2002 | SE | 22.03.2002 | BE | 31.03.2002 | CH | 31.03.2002 | LI | 31.03.2002 | DK | 02.04.2002 | PT | 30.09.2002 | GR | 07.10.2002 | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 21.03.2002 | |
FI | 21.03.2002 | ||
IE | 21.03.2002 | ||
LU | 21.03.2002 | ||
SE | 22.03.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 30.09.2002 | ||
GR | 07.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 21.03.2002 | |
IE | 21.03.2002 | ||
LU | 21.03.2002 | ||
SE | 22.03.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 30.09.2002 | ||
GR | 07.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 21.03.2002 | |
IE | 21.03.2002 | ||
SE | 22.03.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 30.09.2002 | ||
GR | 07.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 21.03.2002 | |
IE | 21.03.2002 | ||
SE | 22.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 30.09.2002 | ||
GR | 07.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 21.03.2002 | |
IE | 21.03.2002 | ||
SE | 22.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
PT | 30.09.2002 | ||
GR | 07.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | IE | 21.03.2002 | |
SE | 22.03.2002 | ||
PT | 30.09.2002 | ||
GR | 07.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | IE | 21.03.2002 | |
SE | 22.03.2002 | ||
GR | 07.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | IE | 21.03.2002 | |
SE | 22.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | SE | 22.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0428252 (NEWS DATA SECURITY PRODUCTS LT [HK]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5029207 (GAMMIE KEITH B [CA]) [A] 1,7,10* abstract *; | [A]EP0658054 (NEWS DATACOM LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 37 - column 4, line 31 *; | [A] - COUTROT F ET AL, "A SINGLE CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM FOR SATELLITE-CABLE AND TERRESTRIAL TV", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19890801), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 464 - 468, XP000065971 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.44305 | Examination | US5111504 | - Chapters 2 and 3 of "Applied Cryptography" by Schneier, second edition, published by John Wiley and Sons Inc., 18 October 1995. | - "Protocols for Public Key Cryptosystems" by Merkle, published in Proceedings of the 1980 Symposium on Security and Privacy, pp. 122-134, Published: New York, NY, USA, 1980. | - "Issues in the Design of a Key Distribution Centre" by Price and Davies, NPL Report DNACS 43/81, April 1981. | - "Cryptographic Key Distribution for Terminal to Terminal Communications" by Lennon, Matyas and Meyer, published in IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 22, No. 2, July 1979, pages 636 to 639. | - "Functional model of a conditional access system" by EBU Project Group B/CA, published in EBU Technical Review, Winter 1995, No. 266, Grand-Saconnex, CH, pages 64 to 77. |