EP0888663 - TURBOMACHINE, ESPECIALLY FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhofer Strasse 135 90429 Nürnberg / DE | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERN, Dietmar Klosterweg 82 D-90455 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
DIJKSTRA, Jan Eibenstrasse 18 D-90574 Ro tal / DE | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H., et al AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen 90327 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Schröer, Gernot, Dipl.-Phys., et al AEG Hausgeräte GmbH, Patente, Marken & Lizenzen 90327 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97916405.0 | 27.03.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997EP01567 | Priority number, date | DE1996112595 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19612595 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9737423 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0888663 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/04, H02K21/14, H02K7/14, H02K1/06 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H02K1/276 (EP);
A47L5/22 (EP);
H02K21/16 (EP);
H02K29/08 (EP);
H02K9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Extension states | AL | 30.06.1998 | LT | 30.06.1998 | LV | 30.06.1998 | RO | 30.06.1998 | SI | 30.06.1998 | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN HAUSHALTSGERÄT | [1999/01] | English: | TURBOMACHINE, ESPECIALLY FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE | [1999/01] | French: | TURBOMACHINE DESTINEE NOTAMMENT A UN APPAREIL ELECTROMENAGER | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 01.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/16] | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 17.11.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0358806 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2,4-6,20,22 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 11 * [Y] 9-14,17-19,21; | [XY]FR2458933 (AUXILEC) [X] 1-3,15,16 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 22; figures 1,2 * [Y] 19,21; | [Y]US4845837 (LLOYD JERRY D) [Y] 9-12,14 * column 1, line 36 - line 41 * * column 4, line 40 - line 60; figures 2,5; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE4033454 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [Y] 9-12 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 11; figures 1,5 *; | [PA]JPH08223832 ; | [A]JPH06331384 ; | [YA]EP0345150 (VENTILATION ET D ELECTRICITE A ;GRADIENT (FR)) [Y] 19,21 * column 3, line 60 - line 65; figure 2 * [A] 1,2; | [Y]EP0391338 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 13 * column 5, line 28 - line 57; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP0602007 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 17 * page 2, line 2 - line 9; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE2703175 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 18 * figure 1 *; | [Y]JPH06261847 ; | [YA]US5041749 (MIRKO GASER) [Y] 19,21 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 4; figure 2 * * column 6, line 13 * [A] 1 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 096, no. 012, & JP08223832 A 19960830 (HITACHI LTD;JAPAN SERVO CO LTD) [PA] 9,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 095, no. 003, & JP06331384 A 19941202 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 12 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941214), vol. 018, no. 662, Database accession no. (C - 1287), & JP06261847 A 19940920 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 18 * abstract * |