EP0908301 - METALLIC SHEET COVERED WITH A POLYESTER RESIN FILM AND HAVING HIGH WORKABILITY, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/15] | METALLIC SHEET COVERED WITH POLYESTER RESIN FILM AND HAVING HIGH WORKABILITY, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
[2006/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO KOHAN Co., Ltd 4-3 Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [2006/27] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states TOYO KOHAN Co., Ltd 4-3 Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASHITA, Hiroyuki, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken 744 / JP | 02 /
GOTOH, Fumiko, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-Ken 744 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Atsuo, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamats-shi Yamaguchi-Ken 744 / JP | [2006/21] |
Former [2006/20] | 01 /
IWASHITA, Hiroyuki, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudmatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken 744 / JP | ||
02 /
GOTOH, Fumiko, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-Ken 744 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA, Atsuo, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamats-shi Yamaguchi-Ken 744 / JP | |||
Former [2006/19] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
GOTOH, Fumiko, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 744 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA, Atsuo, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 744 / JP | |||
Former [1999/15] | 01 /
IWASHITA, Hiroyuki, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamattsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 744 / JP | ||
02 /
GOTOH, Fumiko, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 744 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA, Atsuo, Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. Technical Research Laboratory, 1296-1,Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 744 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97916642.8 | 10.04.1997 | [1999/15] | WO1997JP01242 | Priority number, date | JP19960112127 | 10.04.1996 Original published format: JP 11212796 | [1999/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737846 | Date: | 16.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0908301 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0908301 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, B32B37/00 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/09 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B37/04 (EP,US);
B32B38/12 (EP,US);
B32B2307/518 (EP,US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2439/00 (US);
B32B2439/70 (US);
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | B32B15/08, B32B31/00 | ||
Former IPC [1999/15] | B32B15/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/15] | Title | German: | METALLBLECH, DAS MIT EINER POLYESTERHARZFOLIE BESCHICHTET IST UND EINE GUTE BEARTBEITBARKEIT AUFWEIST, UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/24] | English: | METALLIC SHEET COVERED WITH A POLYESTER RESIN FILM AND HAVING HIGH WORKABILITY, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2006/24] | French: | FEUILLE METALLIQUE RECOUVERTE D'UN FILM DE RESINE POLYESTER ET POSSEDANT DE BONNES CARACTERISTIQUES D'EXPLOITATION, ET PROCEDE DE SON FABRICATION | [2006/24] |
Former [1999/15] | POLYESTERHARZ FILM BESCHICHTETES BEARBEITBARES METALLBLECH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1999/15] | METALLIC SHEET COVERED WITH POLYESTER RESIN FILM AND HAVING HIGH WORKABILITY, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
Former [1999/15] | FEUILLE METALLIQUE RECOUVERTE D'UN FILM DE RESINE POLYESTER ET POSSEDANT DE BONNES CARACTERISTIQUES D'EXPLOITATION, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.1998 | Translation filed | 09.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 31.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.07.2006 | [2008/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01180336 ; | [X]WO9421457 (METAL BOX PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 2, line 15 - line 28 * * page 3, line 5 - line 8 * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 12 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891019), vol. 013, no. 462, Database accession no. (M - 881), & JP01180336 A 19890718 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH01180336 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH02155642 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) |