EP0901743 - BATTERY AND CIRCUITRY ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08540-5300 / US | [1999/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACETI, John, G. 7 Monroe Drive Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | 02 /
SJURSEN, Walter, P. 6 Bankers Drive Washington Crossing, PA 18977 / US | 03 /
LEEDOM, Marvin, A. 26 Cleveland Lane RD 4 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97916836.6 | 26.03.1997 | [1999/11] | WO1997US04402 | Priority number, date | US19960014245P | 26.03.1996 Original published format: US 14245 P | US19960641591 | 01.05.1996 Original published format: US 641591 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736456 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901743 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
H04R25/656 (EP,US);
H04R25/609 (EP,US);
H04R5/04 (EP,US);
H04R2225/31 (EP,US);
H04R25/602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/11] | Title | German: | BATTERIE UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG | [1999/11] | English: | BATTERY AND CIRCUITRY ASSEMBLY | [1999/11] | French: | ENSEMBLE BATTERIE ET CIRCUIT | [1999/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 14.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 01.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.10.1998 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | 27.10.1998 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.10.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1998 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5133016 (CLARK WALLACE); | [Y]US3598928 (HICKOX GEORGE B); | [Y]US5404408 (STROHMAIER HARALD [DE], et al); | [Y]US4712245 (LYREGAARD POUL E [DK]); | [Y]US4962537 (BASEL RAINER [DE], et al) |