EP0904083 - ANESTHETIC METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENVENGA, Mark, J. 434 Meadowview Court Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 02 /
SHANNON, Harlan, E. 4229 Rolling Springs Drive Carmel, IN 46234 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Pritchard, Judith, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Pritchard, Judith, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2001/15] | Vaughan, Jennifer Ann Lilly Research Centre, Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1999/13] | Hudson, Christopher Mark Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97916946.3 | 24.03.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997US04720 | Priority number, date | US19960014120 | 25.03.1996 Original published format: US 14120 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9735585 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904083 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/55, C07D495/04 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61P23/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/55, A61K31/485 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANESTHÄSIE | [1999/13] | English: | ANESTHETIC METHOD | [1999/13] | French: | METHODE D'ANESTHESIE | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/19] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5229382 (CHAKRABARTI JIBAN KUMAR [GB], et al) [XD] 12 * column 2, line 53 *; | [PX]EP0733368 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [PX] 12 * claim 10 *; | [PA]EP0733635 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PA] 3,10 * page 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 5, line 55 - line 56 * * page 6, line 3 - line 4 *; | [PX]WO9709985 (CYGNUS THERAPEUTIC SYSTEMS [US]) [PX] 12 * claims 1,11 * * page 3, lines 18,19 *; | [E]WO9735586 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [E] 1-13 * claims 9,14-28 *; | [E]WO9735583 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [E] 1-13* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5229382 (CHAKRABARTI JIBAN KUMAR [GB], et al); | [AP]US5605987 (KAWAKAMI YUKICHIKA [JP], et al) |