EP0894837 - FLUORORUBBER COATING COMPOSITION AND COATED ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMIHASHI, Nobuyuki, Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | 02 /
OGITA, Koichiro, Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | 03 /
TERASAKA, Kiyotaro, Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | 04 /
KINOSHITA, Toshiyuki, Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97917396.0 | 16.04.1997 | [1999/05] | WO1997JP01306 | Priority number, date | JP19960093940 | 16.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9394096 | [1999/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739071 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894837 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09D127/12, C09D127/18 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
C09D127/12 (EP);
C09D127/18 (EP);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L27/12 (EP);
C08L27/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D127/12, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C09D127/18, C08L2666/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/05] | Title | German: | FLUORKAUTSCHUK BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND BESCHICHTETE GEGENSTÄNDE | [1999/05] | English: | FLUORORUBBER COATING COMPOSITION AND COATED ARTICLES | [1999/05] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT A BASE DE CAOUTCHOUC FLUORE ET ARTICLES RECOUVERTS DE CE REVETEMENT | [1999/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1998 | Translation filed | 05.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/15] | 08.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH04213476 ; | [Y]JPS5861347 ; | [Y]JPS57135871 ; | [Y]JPS59166516 |