EP0839921 - STEEL HAVING IMPROVED TOUGHNESS IN WELDING HEAT-AFFECTED ZONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA, Takuya, Nippon Steel Corporation 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 299-12 / JP | 02 /
ASAHI, Hitoshi, Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 299-12 / JP | 03 /
TAMEHIRO, Hiroshi, Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 299-12 / JP | 04 /
UEMORI, Ryuji, Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 299-12 / JP | 05 /
SAITO, Naoki, Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 299-12 / JP | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/19] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97917423.2 | 17.04.1997 | [1998/19] | WO1997JP01335 | Priority number, date | JP19960095625 | 17.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9562596 | JP19960336174 | 16.12.1996 Original published format: JP 33617496 | [1998/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739157 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839921 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839921 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/14, C22C38/58, C22C38/06, C21C7/04 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (KR);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/58 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1998/19] | C22C38/00, C22C38/14, C22C38/58 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/19] | Title | German: | STAHL MIT VERBESSERTER ZÄHIGKEIT IN DURCH SCHWEI EN WÄRMEBEAUFSCHLAGTER ZONEN | [1998/19] | English: | STEEL HAVING IMPROVED TOUGHNESS IN WELDING HEAT-AFFECTED ZONE | [1998/19] | French: | ACIER POSSEDANT UNE PLUS GRANDE SOLIDITE DANS LES ZONES AFFECTEES PAR LA CHALEUR DE SOUDURES | [1998/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1997 | Translation filed | 08.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 08.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 02.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07216496 ; | [X]JPH07216498 ; | [X]JPH0543977 ; | [XP]WO9623909 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1-3 *see also EP-A1-0 757 113 family member*; | [A]JPS60245768 ; | [A]JPS52133819 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, & JP07216496 A 19950815 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, & JP07216498 A 19950815 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930630), vol. 017, no. 345, Database accession no. (C - 1077), & JP05043977 A 19930223 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860506), vol. 010, no. 120, Database accession no. (C - 343), & JP60245768 A 19851205 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780308), vol. 002, no. 034, Database accession no. (C - 005), & JP52133819 A 19771109 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0543977 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JPH05171341 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JPH06179942 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JPH05345950 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [Y]JPH04362156 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [Y]JPS54160511 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JPS4953504 |