EP0890133 - LINEARIZED OPTIC MODULATOR WITH SEGMENTED ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRYSTAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. 1040 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [1999/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKEIE, Halvor 3338 Pearltone Drive San Jose, CA 95117 / US | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/02] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Buchner, Mussgnug Neunert, Göhring Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97917522.1 | 13.03.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997US03968 | Priority number, date | US19960624162 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: US 624162 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737278 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890133 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/225, G02F1/313 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
G02F1/225 (EP,US);
G02F1/3136 (EP,US);
G02F1/311 (EP,US);
G02F2203/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/02] | Title | German: | LINEARISIERTER OPTISCHER MODULATOR MIT SEGMENTIERTEN ELEKTRODEN | [1999/02] | English: | LINEARIZED OPTIC MODULATOR WITH SEGMENTED ELECTRODES | [1999/02] | French: | MODULATEUR OPTIQUE LINEARISE A ELECTRODES SEGMENTEES | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 08.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US5249243 (SKEIE HALVOR [US]) [XD] 1-15 * column 13, line 01 - column 15, line 27; figure 15 *; | [AD]US5148503 (SKEIE HALVOR [US]) [AD] 1 * column 8, line 38 - line 63; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0239220 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 07 - line 19; figure 5 * | [X] - SKEIE H, "An optically linearized modulator for CATV applications", INTEGRATED OPTICS AND MICROSTRUCTURES II, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, 26-28 JULY 1994, ISSN 0277-786X, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, 1994, USA, vol. 2291, pages 227 - 238, XP000603209 [X] 1-7,9-15 * chapter 3.: Electrical Matching; page 230; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.190911 | [A] - HOWERTON M M ET AL, "Effect of intrinsic phase mismatch on linear modulator performance of the 1*2 directional coupler and Mach-Zehnder interferometer", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, AUG. 1990, USA, ISSN 0733-8724, vol. 8, no. 8, pages 1177 - 1186, XP000174449 [A] 12-15 * figure 1(b) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.57838 | [A] - BETTS G E ET AL, "Optical analog link using a linearized modulator", LEOS '94. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. IEEE LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS SOCIETY 1994 7TH ANNUAL MEETING (CAT. NO.94CH3371-2), PROCEEDINGS OF LEOS'94, BOSTON, MA, USA, 31 OCT.-3 NOV. 1994, ISBN 0-7803-1470-0, 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 278 - 279 vol.2, XP000510701 [A] 1-5 * figure 2 * |