EP0892611 - MODIFIED ATMOSPHERE PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pactiv Corporation 1900 West Field Court Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | [2002/13] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states Tenneco Packaging Inc. 1603 Orrington Avenue Evanston, Illinois 60204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELDUCA, Gary, R. 82 Howell Street Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | 02 /
DEYO, Alan, E. 66 S. Main Street Rushville, NY 14544 / US | 03 /
LUTHRA, Vinod, K. 21 Barrington Hills Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 04 /
WU, Wen, P. 4 Silver Pines Drive Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker, August Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97917628.6 | 26.03.1997 | [1999/04] | WO1997US04893 | Priority number, date | US19960627137 | 03.04.1996 Original published format: US 627137 | [1999/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736504 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892611 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892611 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/00, B65D81/26, B65D81/20, A23L3/3436 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
B65D81/26 (EP,US);
A23B4/16 (EP,US);
A23L3/3418 (EP,US);
A23L3/3436 (EP,US);
B65D77/003 (EP,US);
B65D81/268 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/04] | A23L3/3436 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/04] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG MIT VERÄNDERTER ATMOSPHÄRE | [1999/04] | English: | MODIFIED ATMOSPHERE PACKAGE | [1999/04] | French: | EMBALLAGE A ATMOSPHERE MODIFIEE | [1999/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US3574642 (WEINKE KARL FREDERICK); | [X]US3419400 (HAYHURST LEWIS J, et al) | [Y] - FRAN LABELL, "Controlled & Modified Atmosphere Packaging", Published January 1985, FOOD PROCESSING, pages 152-154. | by applicant | US3574642 | US5115624 |