EP0836426 - WEDGE SHAPED SUTURE ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/17] | WEDGE SHAPED SUTURE ANCHOR AND METHOD OF IMPLANTATION | ||
[2003/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitek Surgical Products, Inc. 60 Glacier Drive Westwood Massachusetts 02090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states Mitek Surgical Products, Inc. 60 Glacier Drive Westwood, Massachusetts 02090 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDLICK, Jack, S. 68 Outlook Street Butler, NJ 07405 / US | 02 /
LE, Thu, Anh 118 Wainwright Drive Matawan, NJ 07747 / US | 03 /
DIGIOVANNI, John 5 Winston Drive Woodbridge, NJ 07095 / US | 04 /
JAMIOLKOWSKI, Dennis, D. 20 Fawnridge Drive Long Valley, NJ 07853 / US | 05 /
SUSECK, Mark, J. 34 Olden Drive Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97917914.0 | 09.04.1997 | [1998/17] | WO1997US05925 | Priority number, date | US19960630389 | 10.04.1996 Original published format: US 630389 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737595 | Date: | 16.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836426 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836426 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/04 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B90/92 (EP,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00424 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00455 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00862 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0458 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06142 (EP,US);
A61B2090/037 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/17] | A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1998/17] | Title | German: | KEILFÖRMIGER NÄHFADENANKER | [2003/28] | English: | WEDGE SHAPED SUTURE ANCHOR | [2003/28] | French: | ANCRE CUNEIFORME DE FIL DE SUTURE | [2003/28] |
Former [1998/17] | KEILFÖRMIGER NÄHFADENANKER UND IMPLANTIERUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1998/17] | WEDGE SHAPED SUTURE ANCHOR AND METHOD OF IMPLANTATION | ||
Former [1998/17] | ANCRE CUNEIFORME DE FIL DE SUTURE ET SON PROCEDE D'IMPLANTATION | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.03.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | ES | 21.06.2004 | [2005/02] |
Former [2005/01] | BE | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 10.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4702250 (OVIL YOEL [IL], et al) [A] 22* column 5, line 44 - line 53 *; | [A]US5046513 (GATTURNA ROLAND F [US], et al) [A] 15,19 * column 7, line 31 - line 39 *; | [A]US5354298 (LEE DANIEL R [US], et al) [A] 15 * column 4, line 40 - line 44 *; | [XA]EP0684013 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-14,28 * figures 1-23 * [A] 19,22; | [A]CA2159295 (MITEK SURGICAL PROD [US]) [A] 15,18 * page 24, paragraph 2 - page 25, paragraph 1 * * page 27, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * | International search | [Y]US4553543 (AMARASINGHE DISAMODHA C [US]); | [A]US5203787 (NOBLITT NILES [US], et al); | [X]US5464425 (SKIBA JEFFRY B [US]) | by applicant | - ISHIKAWA ET AL., "Effect of Hydroxyapatite containing Glass Coating on the Bonding between bone and Tianium Implants", CLINICAL MATERIALS, (1993), vol. 14, page 277-285 |