EP0923376 - USE OF STEROIDS FOR TREATMENT OF ASTHMA AND AIRWAY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/25] | TREATMENT OF ASTHMA AND AIRWAY DISEASES | ||
[2004/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amrad Operations Pty., Ltd. 576 Swan Street Richmond, VIC 3121 / AU | [1999/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEWART, Alastair G., B.O'Brien Inst.of Microsurg. 42 Fitzroy Street Fitzroy, VIC 3065 / AU | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97917945.4 | 09.05.1997 | [1999/25] | WO1997AU00286 | Priority number, date | AU1996PN09766 | 09.05.1996 Original published format: AU PN976696 | AU1996PN09918 | 20.05.1996 Original published format: AU PN991896 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742958 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923376 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923376 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/56, A61K31/565, A61P11/00, A61P11/06 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/566 (EP,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/25] | A61K31/56, A61K31/565 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/25] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON STEROIDEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ASTHMA UND ATEMWEGERKRANKUNGEN | [2004/18] | English: | USE OF STEROIDS FOR TREATMENT OF ASTHMA AND AIRWAY DISEASES | [2004/18] | French: | UTILISATION DE STEROIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ASTHME ET DES TROUBLES DES VOIES RESPIRATOIRES | [2004/19] |
Former [1999/25] | BEHANDLUNG VON ASTHMA UND ATEMWEGERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [1999/25] | TREATMENT OF ASTHMA AND AIRWAY DISEASES | ||
Former [1999/25] | TRAITEMENT DE L'ASTHME ET DE TROUBLES DES VOIES RESPIRATOIRES | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 08.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 08.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2004 | BE | 03.11.2004 | CH | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | LI | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | SE | 03.02.2005 | ES | 14.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | IE | 09.05.2005 | LU | 09.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
LU | 09.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
LU | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]RU2028083 ; | [AX]US3274056 (WARREN CANTRALL EDWARD, et al) [A] 7,8 * table 1 * * claims 4-6 * [X] 11; | [AX]US4427669 (BLAKE CHARLES A [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * column 1, line 5 - line 27 * [X] 11; | [X]EP0535595 (APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY INST [JP]) [X] 11 * claim 8 * * example 3B *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 38, Database accession no. 1995-291153, XP002173167 & RU2028083 C 19950209 (MOSC SECHENOV MED INST) [X] 1-6,9-12 * abstract * | [X] - POLVERINO, "bronchial hyperresponsiveness...", LOTTA CONTRO LA TUBERCOLOSI E LE MALATTIE POLMONARI SOCIALI, (1990), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 167 - 171, XP001014433 [X] 1-4,6,9,10 * page 168, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 170, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [X] - CLARK, "glucocorticoids inhibit trypsin-induced ...", J. IMMUNOL., (1979), vol. 123, no. 1, pages 487 - 495, XP001010450 [X] 1-4,6,9,10 * page 487, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 494, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [X] - WAN, YOU ET AL, "Effect of estradiol on asthma of guinea pigs and its relationship to.beta. adrenergic receptors", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19951023), vol. 123, no. 17, Database accession no. 225808, XP002173166 [X] 1-6,9 * abstract * | [ ] - ZHONGGUO YAOLIXUE TONGBAO (1993), 9(4), 295-7 | International search | [X]JP04297421 ; | [X]US4420428 (VARMA RAVI K [US]); | [X]EP0144086 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [X]US4529547 (VARMA RAVI K [US]); | [X]US4529548 (VARMA RAVI K [US], et al); | [X]EP0172672 (HOVIONE INT LTD [CH]); | [X]EP0452914 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [X]AU2178992 (SCHERING CORP); | [X]AU2017592 (SCHERING CORP); | [X]WO9414834 (RHONE POULENC RORER LTD [GB], et al); | [X]AU1727195 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME); | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, C-1033, page 25; & JP,A,04 297 421 (KAO CORP), 21 October 1992., & JP04297421 A 19921021 | [X] - LEE H J, TARAPOREWALA I B, HEIMAN A S, "ANTI-INFLAMMATORY STEROIDS: RESEARCH TRENDS AND NEW COMPOUNDS", DRUGS OF TODAY / MEDICAMENTOS DE ACTUALIDAD., J.R. PROUS SS.A. INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHERS, ES, ES, (19890101), vol. 25, no. 09, ISSN 0025-7656, pages 577 - 588, XP002947795 | [X] - RICHARDS I M, ET AL., "NOVEL STEROID-BASED INHIBITORS OF LUNG INFLAMMATION", Clinical & Experimental Allergy : journal of the British Society for Allergy and Clinical Immunology, Wiley InterScience, UK, UK, (19920101), vol. 22, ISSN 0954-7894, pages 432 - 439, XP002947796 | Examination | - FOTSIS TH. ET AL, "The endogenous oestrogen metabolite 2-mezthoxyestradiol inhibits angiogenesis and suppresses tumuor growth", NATURE, (19940317), vol. 368, no. 17, pages 237 - 239 |