EP0879080 - FILTER RUN-OFF WITH SPRING SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ing. Walter Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 75 48147 Münster / DE | [1998/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUMANN, Heiko Innsbruckweg 14 D-48145 Münster / DE | 02 /
WIEMEYER, Gerhard Bosostrasse 1 D-48308 Senden / DE | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Ludwig, et al Habbel & Habbel Patentanwälte Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Habbel, Ludwig (Lutz), et al Habbel & Habbel, Patentanwälte, Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 97917992.6 | 05.02.1997 | [1998/48] | WO1997DE00215 | Priority number, date | DE1996202330U | 10.02.1996 Original published format: DE 29602330 U | [1998/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728880 | Date: | 14.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879080 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0879080 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/153, B01D35/16 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
B01D35/153 (EP,KR,US);
B01D35/16 (EP,US);
F02M37/42 (EP,US);
F01M2001/1064 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86308 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/48] | Title | German: | FILTERABLAUF MIT FEDERVERSCHLUSS | [1998/48] | English: | FILTER RUN-OFF WITH SPRING SEAL | [1998/48] | French: | EVACUATION DE FILTRE A OBTURATEUR A RESSORT | [1998/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 20.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3317046 (RAUPP RAY J, et al) [Y] 2-4,7 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3017003 (TRASKO BEE CORP [JP]) [Y] 2 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US4354931 (ALLORI ALDO, et al) [Y] 2,7 * figure 2 *; | [XY]DE3344568 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 13 - line 19; figure 1 * [Y] 2-4,7,9; | [Y]DE3933794 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9* figure 1 * |