EP0981880 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR NOISE-PREDICTIVE MAXIMUM LIKELIHOOD DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COKER, Jonathan, Darrel 1605 5th Street Northeast Rochester, MN 55901 / US | 02 /
ELEFTHERIOU, Evangelos, Stavros Bellariastrasse 53 CH-8038 Zurich / CH | 03 /
GALBRAITH, Richard, Leo 5225 Wendy Lane SWt Rochester, MN 55902 / US | 04 /
HIRT, Walter Hinderweidstrasse 29 CH-8907 Wettswil / CH | [2000/10] |
Former [2000/09] | 01 /
COKER, Jonathan, Darrel 1605 5th Street Northeast Rochester, MN 55901 / US | ||
02 /
ELEFTHERIOU, Evangelos, Stavros Bellariastrasse 53 CH-8038 Zurich / CH | |||
03 /
GALBRAITH, Richard, Leo 2232 N.W. 52 Street Rochester, MN 55901 / US | |||
04 /
HIRT, Walter Hinderweidstrasse 29 CH-8907 Wettswil / CH | Representative(s) | Heusch, Christian, et al International Business Machines Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Heusch, Christian, et al International Business Machines Corporation, Saümerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 97918303.5 | 15.05.1997 | [2000/09] | WO1997IB00554 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852330 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981880 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981880 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03, H04L25/497 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G11B20/10175 (EP,US);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/09] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR RAUSCHVORHERSAGENDEN MAXIMAL-WAHRSCHEINLICHKEITSDETEKTION | [2000/09] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR NOISE-PREDICTIVE MAXIMUM LIKELIHOOD DETECTION | [2000/09] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION PAR MAXIMUM DE VRAISEMBLANCE A PREDICTION DE BRUIT | [2003/04] |
Former [2000/09] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DETECTION DE VRAISEMBLANCE MAXIMALE A PREDICTION DE BRUIT | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.07.2003 | [2008/07] | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9711544 (IBM [US]) [AD] 1-16 * abstract * * figure 2D *; | [A] - CHEVILLAT P R ET AL, "NOISE-PREDICTIVE PARTIAL-RESPONSE EQUALIZERS AND APPLICATIONS", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, ICC'92, CHICAGO, US, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920614), vol. 2 OF 4, pages 942 - 947, XP000326811 [A] 1-16 * see section II;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1992.268073 | [AD] - DUEL-HALLEN A ET AL, "DELAYED DECISION-FEEDBACK SEQUENCE ESTIMATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (198905), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 428 - 436, XP000670554 [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.24594 | [A] - MOHAMMAD GHAVAMI ET AL, "DECISION FEEDBACK EQUALIZATION OF HDSL USING A GENERALIZED ADAPTIVE IIR DELAY FILTER", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES, (19940501), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 37/337 - 46/346, XP000456626 [A] 1-16 * see section 2;; figure 1 * |