EP0905292 - SPONTANEOUSLY DEGRADABLE FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/13] | SPONTANEOUSLY DEGRADABLE FIBERS AND GOODS MADE BY USING THE SAME | ||
[2004/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEBO LTD. 17-4, Sumida 5 chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-0031 / JP | [2004/43] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states KANEBO LTD. 17-4, Sumida 5 chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Masao, Shimadzu Corporation, Sanjo-Work 1 , Nishinokyo-kuwabara-cho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, oKyoto 604 / JP | 02 /
OZEKI, Eiichi, Shimadzu Corporation, Sanjo-Work 1, Nishinokyo-kuwabara-cho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Koyoto 604 / JP | 03 /
KONDO, Yoshikazu 5-31, Kokuga 2-chome Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747 / JP | 04 /
KAJIYAMA, Hiroshi 6-6-305, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747 / JP | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97918408.2 | 12.05.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997JP01588 | Priority number, date | JP19960119245 | 14.05.1996 Original published format: JP 11924596 | JP19960119246 | 14.05.1996 Original published format: JP 11924696 | JP19960119247 | 14.05.1996 Original published format: JP 11924796 | JP19960125998 | 21.05.1996 Original published format: JP 12599896 | JP19960125999 | 21.05.1996 Original published format: JP 12599996 | JP19960145408 | 07.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14540896 | JP19960238114 | 09.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23811496 | JP19960238115 | 09.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23811596 | JP19960256625 | 27.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25662596 | [1999/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743472 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905292 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905292 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D01F8/14, D04H1/54, D01F6/92 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
D01D5/22 (EP,US);
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
D01F8/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2904 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2924 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/13] | Title | German: | SPONTAN ABBAUBARE FASERN | [2004/10] | English: | SPONTANEOUSLY DEGRADABLE FIBERS | [2004/10] | French: | FIBRES DEGRADABLES SPONTANEMENT | [2004/10] |
Former [1999/13] | SPONTAN ABBAUBARE FASERN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE ARTIKEL | ||
Former [1999/13] | SPONTANEOUSLY DEGRADABLE FIBERS AND GOODS MADE BY USING THE SAME | ||
Former [1999/13] | FIBRES DEGRADABLES SPONTANEMENT ET ARTICLES CONSTITUES DE CELLES-CI | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1998 | Translation filed | 09.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 27.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04023800.8 / EP1520918 | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.10.2004 | NL | 20.10.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/51] | BE | 20.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH07310236 (KANEBO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH0734369 (UNITIKA LTD); | [A]US5254616 (BENKO DAVID A [US], et al); | [AE]JPH0941223 (JAPAN VILENE CO LTD) |