EP0895571 - ARAMID BALLISTIC STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHITRANGAD 1900 Winterfield Road Midlothian, VA 23113 / US | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1999/06] | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97918515.4 | 03.04.1997 | [1999/06] | WO1997US05632 | Priority number, date | US19960636446 | 23.04.1996 Original published format: US 636446 | [1999/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9740333 | Date: | 30.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895571 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895571 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/04 | [1999/06] | CPC: |
F41H5/0485 (EP,US);
Y10S428/911 (EP,US);
Y10T428/237 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3602 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3634 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3927 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3976 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/06] | Title | German: | ARAMID BALLISTISCHE STRUKTUR | [1999/06] | English: | ARAMID BALLISTIC STRUCTURE | [1999/06] | French: | STRUCTURE BALISTIQUE EN ARAMIDE | [1999/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2409087 (WEINBERGER JAN V) [Y] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 1 - line 5 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 61 *; | [A]US4522871 (ARMELLINO JR RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1,4* claim 1 *; | [A]WO9117408 (LEONE DEMETRIO [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5275873 (CHITRANGAD [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 23 *; | [Y]GB2286798 (PARAFLY SA [ES]) [Y] 1,4,5 * abstract * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 7 * |