EP0986656 - MONOFILAMENTS WITH SPLIT ENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | ||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RACKLEY, Robert, L. 119 Canterbury Drive Parkersburg, WV 26104 / US | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Morf, Jan Stefan Patentanwälte Abitz und Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/17] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/16] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/12] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97918786.1 | 24.04.1997 | [2000/12] | WO1997US06780 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848086 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986656 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986656 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/08, A46B1/00, A46B9/04 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
A46D1/0238 (EP);
A46D1/00 (EP);
A46D1/0292 (EP);
D01D5/24 (EP);
D01D5/253 (EP);
A46B2200/1066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/12] | Title | German: | MONOFILAMENTE MIT GESPALTENEN ENDEN | [2000/12] | English: | MONOFILAMENTS WITH SPLIT ENDS | [2000/12] | French: | MONOFILAMENTS A EXTREMITES FENDUES | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYX]US5128208 (BOND WILLIAM B ET AL) [DY] 1,3,4,7,8,13,22-27 * column 2, line 10 - line 20 * * column 2, line 42 - line 64 * * column 3, line 46 - line 47 * * column 4, line 4 - line 10; figures 1,2 * [X] 9,11,12,14-16,20; | [Y]EP0450210 (NEWELL OPERATING CO) [Y] 1,3,4,7,8,13,23 * abstract * * page 4, line 13 - line 19; figures 1,4,5 *; | [Y]DE4442001 (HAHN RAINER) [Y] 22-27 * claims 1-3 *; | [DX]US4279053 (PAYNE ROBERT H ET AL) [DX] 29-31 * column 3, line 31 - line 44; figures 2,3 * |