EP0925139 - MULTIWIRE WELDING TORCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alexander Binzel GmbH & Co. KG Kiesacker 7-9 D-35418 Buseck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states ALEXANDER BINZEL GmbH & Co. KG Kiesacker 7-9 D-35418 Buseck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPERLING, Hermann Am Schwarzfelder Weg 24 D-55296 Gau-Bischofsheim / DE | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Müller, Eckhard Mühlstrasse 9a 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | [2008/44] |
Former [1999/26] | Müller, Eckhard, Dr. Eifelstrasse 14 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 97919022.0 | 02.09.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997EP04778 | Priority number, date | DE19961035607 | 02.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19635607 | [1999/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9809766 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925139 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925139 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/18 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
B23K9/188 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/26] | Title | German: | MEHRDRAHTSCHWEISSBRENNER | [1999/26] | English: | MULTIWIRE WELDING TORCH | [1999/26] | French: | CHALUMEAU MULTIFILAIRE | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.2003
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR Opponent's representative Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.2003
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR Opponent's representative Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 15.04.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.07.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.07.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9200160 (TAFA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB741989 (LINCOLN ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,2,4 * page 9, column R, paragraph L - page 10, column R, paragraph 1; figure 18 *; | [X]US4246463 (SHUTT ROBERT C, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0256126 (VNI PK T I ELEKTROSVAROTSCHNO [SU]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * |