EP0874880 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING OF HYDROCARBON FEEDSTOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalFinaElf France Tour Total, 24, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states TotalfinaElf France Tour Total, 24, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION S.A. Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERSING, Marc 425 N. Luce Road Alma, MI 48801 / US | 02 /
DEL POZO, Mariano 43, rue Jules Siegfried F-76600 Le Havre / FR | 03 /
GAUTHIER, Thierry 4, domaine de la Côte F-69530 Brignais / FR | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97919102.0 | 16.09.1997 | [1998/45] | WO1997FR01627 | Priority number, date | FR19960011369 | 18.09.1996 Original published format: FR 9611369 | [1998/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812279 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874880 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874880 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | FLUIDKATALYTISCH KRACKVERFAHREN UND -EINRICHTUNG FUR KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEINSÄTZE | [1998/45] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING OF HYDROCARBON FEEDSTOCK | [1998/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CRAQUAGE CATALYTIQUE EN LIT FLUIDISE D'UNE CHARGE D'HYDROCARBURES | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 08.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2004 | FI | 07.07.2004 | IE | 07.07.2004 | CH | 30.09.2004 | LI | 30.09.2004 | DK | 07.10.2004 | GR | 07.10.2004 | SE | 07.10.2004 | PT | 07.12.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/12] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 07.07.2004 | ||
CH | 30.09.2004 | ||
LI | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 07.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0209442 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 28 - line 38; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0315179 (BARTHOLIC DAVID B); | [A]EP0344032 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figure 8 *; | [A]EP0479645 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [A]EP0663434 (TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION [FR]) |