EP0904018 - CONTAINER FOR SHARP INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavanagh, Michael Shane 301 Lieutenant Bowen Drive Bowen Mountain, NSW 2753 / AU | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/13] | Schüll, Gottfried Dipl.-Phys. COHAUSZ & FLORACK Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97919191.3 | 29.04.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997AU00259 | Priority number, date | AU1996PN09597 | 30.04.1996 Original published format: AU PN959796 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9740753 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904018 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904018 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, A61B19/02 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
A61B50/20 (EP,US);
A61B17/06061 (EP,US);
A61B17/3217 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3011 (EP,US);
A61B50/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR SCHARFE INSTRUMENTE | [1999/13] | English: | CONTAINER FOR SHARP INSTRUMENTS | [1999/13] | French: | LOGEMENT POUR INSTRUMENTS TRANCHANTS | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 03.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 03.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2004 | Observations by third parties | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2005 | Observations by third parties | 19.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2004 | 30.04.2005 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2006 | BE | 02.11.2006 | CH | 02.11.2006 | FI | 02.11.2006 | LI | 02.11.2006 | NL | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.02.2007 | SE | 02.02.2007 | DE | 03.02.2007 | GR | 03.02.2007 | PT | 02.04.2007 | LU | 29.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2009/18] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
DE | 03.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
DE | 03.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
DE | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 02.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4967914 (KEETON WILLIAM F [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,11-14,16,17 * abstract *; | [A]US4974728 (COLTON TIMOTHY S [US]) [A] * abstract *; | [XY]US5097963 (CHERNOSKY MARVIN E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 9,10; | [X]US5339955 (HORAN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11,15,18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5363862 (MERCIER CHARLES W [US]) [Y] 9,10 * abstract * | International search | [X]US3013656 (MURPHY JR WILLIAM P); | [X]US3696920 (LAHAY CHARLES ARTHUR); | [X]WO8808313 (MCCAMMON JOHN WESLEY [GB], et al); | [X]US4969554 (SAWAYA FREDERICK J [US]); | [X]FR2646770 (PHONG ROGER [FR]); | [X]WO9408642 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) | [X] - ALLEN & HANBURYS CATALOGUE, 1957 Edition, (ALLEN & HANBURYS, LONDON), page 588, Reference Number 49100. |