EP0864211 - TELECOMMUNICATIONS INFORMATION DISSEMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON TelefonPlan 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSOUKAS, George, James 1/42 Taylor Street North Fitzroy, VIC 3068 / AU | 02 /
McLORINAN, Andrew, George 20 Barrett Street Hampton, VIC 3188 / AU | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Kribber, Klaus-Dieter Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Kribber, Klaus-Dieter Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [1998/38] | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97919192.1 | 29.04.1997 | [1998/38] | WO1997AU00260 | Priority number, date | AU1996PN09550 | 29.04.1996 Original published format: AU PN955096 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741654 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0864211 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04H1/08, H04L12/16, H04L12/18, H04Q7/20, H04B7/26, H04Q7/22 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H04H20/28 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US);
G07F17/16 (EP);
H04L12/189 (EP);
H04L67/306 (EP);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04L67/55 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP);
H04M3/4872 (EP);
H04M3/493 (EP);
H04W4/14 (EP);
H04L12/1895 (EP);
H04L67/63 (EP);
H04M2203/205 (EP);
H04M2207/18 (EP);
H04M2242/30 (EP);
H04M3/5322 (EP);
H04M7/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/38] | H04H1/00, H04H1/08, H04L12/16, H04L12/18, H04Q7/20, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/38] | Title | German: | VERBREITUNGSSYSTEM FÜR FERNMELDEINFORMATION | [1998/38] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATIONS INFORMATION DISSEMINATION SYSTEM | [1998/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIFFUSION D'INFORMATION DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [1998/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 22.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5493692 (THEIMER MARVIN M [US], et al) [A] 1,10,22,31 * column 4, line 25 - line 45; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9605678 (MITRE CORP [US]) [A] 1,10,22,31 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 20; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9609714 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [A] 1,10,22,31 * page 7, line 1 - line 11; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9610895 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,10,22,31* page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 35; claim 1 * | International search | [X]WO9430000 (NEW BRUNSWICK TELEPHONE CO [CA], et al); | [X]AU8184594 (AT & T CORP); | [XP]DE4440419 (ISSING TILMAN [DE], et al) |