EP0894322 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECORDING/ PROCESSING OF AUTHENTIC IMAGE AND/OR AUDIO DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2001 [2001/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Klaus Ernst-Ludwig-Strasse 21 D-64283 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
SCHEERHORN, Alfred Frankfurter Strasse 36 D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/01] |
Former [1999/05] | Kampfenkel, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.DE) Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 97919364.6 | 16.04.1997 | [1999/05] | WO1997EP01891 | Priority number, date | DE1996115301 | 18.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19615301 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9740496 | Date: | 30.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894322 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894322 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/02, G11B20/00 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
G11B20/00123 (EP);
G11B20/00086 (EP);
G11B20/0021 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP);
H04N5/913 (EP);
H04N5/9206 (EP);
H04N5/926 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [1999/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFZEICHNEN/VERARBEITEN VON AUTHENTISCHEN BILD- UND/ODER TONDATEN | [1999/05] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECORDING/ PROCESSING OF AUTHENTIC IMAGE AND/OR AUDIO DATA | [1999/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ENREGISTRER/TRAITER DES DONNEES VIDEO ET/OU AUDIO AUTHENTIQUES | [1999/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 09.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8202111 (AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]WO8600745 (MCWHIRTER HOLDINGS PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4706293 (KNOWD MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US5400185 (SCERBO III FRANK C [US]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * |