EP1012740 - METHOD OF INTEGRATING SCHEMAS OF DISTRIBUTED HETEROGENEOUS DATABASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. 300 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821-4186 / US | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLSHANI, Forouzan 5346 E. Royal Palm Road Paradise Valley, AZ 85253 / US | 02 /
FRIESEN, Oris, D. 5136 E. LeMarche Avenue Scottsdale, AZ 85254-1667 / US | 03 /
HOWELL, Thomas, H. 8201 E. Del Cadena Drive Scottsdale, AZ 85258 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97920038.3 | 20.03.1997 | [2000/26] | WO1997US05411 | Priority number, date | US19960624726 | 26.03.1996 Original published format: US 624726 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9738388 | Date: | 16.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1012740 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F17/30 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G06F16/289 (EP,US);
G06F16/211 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99943 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM INTEGRIEREN VON SCHEMAS VON VERTEILTEN HETEROGENEN DATENBANKEN | [2000/26] | English: | METHOD OF INTEGRATING SCHEMAS OF DISTRIBUTED HETEROGENEOUS DATABASES | [2000/26] | French: | PROCEDE POUR INTEGRER DES SCHEMAS DE BASES DE DONNEES REPARTIES HETEROGENES | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.10.1998 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9503586 (PERSISTENCE SOFTWARE INC [US]) [A] 1* page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 3 *; | [XA] - KEIM D. ET AL., "Integration of Relational Databases in a Multidatabase System Based on Schema Enrichment", PROC. 3RD. INT. WORKSHOP ON RESEARCH ISSUES IN DATA ENGINEERING: INTEROPERABILITY IN MULTIDATABASE SYSTEMS, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY PRESS, USA, (19930419), pages 96 - 104, XP002101385 [X] 1,2 * page 96, column L, line 1 - page 98, column R, line 3 * [A] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RIDE.1993.281939 | [A] - DESAI B C ET AL, "ON SCHEMA INTEGRATION IN A HETEROGENEOUS DISTRIBUTED DATABASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL COMPUTER SOFTWARE AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. (COMPSAC), ORLANDO, SEPT. 20 - 22, 1989, KNAFL G J, (19890920), no. CONF. 13, pages 218 - 224, XP000091509 [A] 1,8,11 * page 218, column L, line 1 - page 221, column R, line 49 * | International search | [XP]US5560005 (HOOVER MICHAEL K [US], et al) |