EP0929446 - TRANSFERRING A STACK FROM A CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens ElectroCom L.P. 2910 Avenue F East Arlington Texas 76011-5276 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Siemens ElectroCom L.P. 2910 Avenue F East Arlington, Texas 76011-5276 / US | ||
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states Siemens ElectroCom L.P. 2910 Avenue F Arlington, Texas 76011-5276 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRES, Luiz, C. 4505 Michelle Drive Arlington, TX 76016 / US | 02 /
KULAS, John, W. 309 Malone Court Euless, TX 76040 / US | 03 /
ROTENBERRY, Joseph, C. 836 Springbrook Bedford, TX 76021 / US | 04 /
McKEE, Kenneth, A. 2427 Atkinson Irving, TX 75060 / US | 05 /
HILL, Lynn, V. 1308 Andante Fort Worth, TX 75215 / US | 06 /
CARLILE, Mark, L. 2731 East Wentworth Carrollton, TX 73100 / US | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97920085.4 | 28.03.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997US05536 | Priority number, date | USA 626251 | 29.03.1996 | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/17] | US19960626251 | 29.03.1996 | |
US19970041431 | 30.01.1997 | ||
Former [2004/17] | US19960626251 | 29.03.1996 | |
[1999/29] | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2004/17] | USA 626251 | 29.03.1996 | |
USA 41431 | 30.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/29] | USA 626251 | 29.03.1996 | |
USA | 30.01.1997 | ||
USA | 28.03.1997 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736788 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929446 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929446 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00, B65H1/30 | [2000/10] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1999/29] | B65B69/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/29] | Title | German: | ÜBERFÜHREN EINES STAPELS AUS EINEM MAGAZIN | [1999/29] | English: | TRANSFERRING A STACK FROM A CARTRIDGE | [1999/29] | French: | TRANSFERT D'UNE PILE D'ARTICLES A PARTIR D'UN CASIER | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 27.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 03.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4022340 ; | [Y]US2690824 ; | [Y]US5478185 ; | [A]US4915571 ; | [A]US4863037 | by applicant | US19960626251 |