EP0929767 - FLEXIBLE CONDUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Oil & Gas UK Limited 2 High Street Nailsea Bristol BS48 1BS / GB | [2015/17] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Wellstream International Limited Wellstream House Wincomblee Road Walker Riverside Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE6 3PF / GB | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Wellstream International Limited 200 Aldersgate Street London EC1A 4JJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Blossomgrange Limited 200 Aldersgate Street London EC1A 4JJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states Wellstream, Inc. Port of Panama City, 1700 Avenue C Panama City, FL 32401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALMAN, Mark, D. 2721 Briarcliff Road Panama City, FL 32405 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Bin 17010 Clan Macintosh Drive Houston, TX 77084 / US | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Uno, Jennifer Elizabeth Hayes, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Boakes, Jason Carrington, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2007/33] | Boakes, Jason Carrington, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2004/39] | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Intellectual Property House, Brussels Airport Business Park Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [1999/29] | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7 1060 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 97920278.5 | 08.04.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997US05905 | Priority number, date | US19960728957 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: US 728957 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9816770 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929767 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/12 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
F16L11/16 (EP,US);
F16L11/083 (EP,US);
F16L9/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DK, FR, GB [1999/29] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE ROHRLEITUNG | [1999/29] | English: | FLEXIBLE CONDUIT | [1999/29] | French: | CONDUIT FLEXIBLE | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 23.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 09.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 20 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0273095 (KANAO SHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-13,16-21 * abstract * [A] 5,15 [Y] 22,23; | [X]US3771570 (COLEMAN N) [X] 1,2,4,6-12,14,16-21 * abstract *; | [X]DE892988 (PFORZHEIM METALLSCHLAUCH) [X] 1,2,4,10-12,14 * figure - *; | [Y]US5406984 (SUGIER ANDRE [FR], et al) [Y] 22,23 * figure - * | International search | [X]US712418 (RUDOLPH CHARLES [FR]); | [X]US1068553 (ABELL ROLLIN [US], et al); | [A]US1145434 (PECHSTEIN MAX [DE]); | [A]US1781574 (FREDERICKSON OTTO A); | [A]US5259418 (HAMRICK JAMES C [US]); | [X]US5275209 (SUGIER ANDRE [FR], et al); | [A]US5406984 (SUGIER ANDRE [FR], et al) |