EP0898611 - HIGH FOAMING DETERGENT COMPOSITION HAVING A NON-IONIC SURFACTANT BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, IT, LI | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEPAN COMPANY 22 West Frontage Road Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states STEPAN COMPANY 22 West Frontage Road Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOX, Steven, J. 555 W. Arlington Place Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 02 /
MALIK, Arshad 1637 Brighton Drive Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97920389.0 | 14.04.1997 | [1999/09] | WO1997US06211 | Priority number, date | US19960631938 | 15.04.1996 Original published format: US 631938 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739094 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0898611 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0898611 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/825, C11D1/94, A61K7/50 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
A61Q5/02 (EP);
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61K8/40 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP);
C11D1/825 (EP);
C11D1/835 (EP);
C11D1/94 (EP);
C11D3/0094 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/09] | Title | German: | STARKSCHÄUMENDE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF GRUNDLAGE EINES NICHTIONISCHEN TENSIDS | [2000/30] | English: | HIGH FOAMING DETERGENT COMPOSITION HAVING A NON-IONIC SURFACTANT BASE | [1999/09] | French: | COMPOSITION DETERGENTE A HAUT POUVOIR MOUSSANT A BASE D'AGENTS TENSIOACTIFS NON IONIQUES | [1999/09] |
Former [1999/09] | STARKSCHÄUMENDES WASCHMITTEL AUF GRUNDLAGE EINES NICHT-IONISCHEN TENSIDER | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 02.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.09.2001 | BE | 05.09.2001 | CH | 05.09.2001 | FI | 05.09.2001 | FR | 05.09.2001 | IT | 05.09.2001 | LI | 05.09.2001 | NL | 05.09.2001 | DK | 05.12.2001 | PT | 05.12.2001 | SE | 05.12.2001 | DE | 06.12.2001 | GR | 07.12.2001 | ES | 26.03.2002 | LU | 14.04.2002 | MC | 14.04.2002 | IE | 15.04.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
FR | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
DK | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.12.2001 | ||
DE | 06.12.2001 | ||
GR | 07.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
LU | 14.04.2002 | ||
MC | 14.04.2002 | ||
IE | 15.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
FR | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
DK | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.12.2001 | ||
DE | 06.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
LU | 14.04.2002 | ||
MC | 14.04.2002 | ||
IE | 15.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
DK | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.12.2001 | ||
DE | 06.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
LU | 14.04.2002 | ||
MC | 14.04.2002 | ||
IE | 15.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
DK | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.12.2001 | ||
DE | 06.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
MC | 14.04.2002 | ||
IE | 15.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
DK | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
DE | 06.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
MC | 14.04.2002 | ||
IE | 15.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
DK | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
DE | 06.12.2001 | ||
MC | 14.04.2002 | ||
IE | 15.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
DE | 06.12.2001 | ||
MC | 14.04.2002 | ||
IE | 15.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
DE | 06.12.2001 | ||
MC | 14.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
DE | 06.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.09.2001 | |
BE | 05.09.2001 | ||
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
NL | 05.09.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | BE | 05.09.2001 | |
FI | 05.09.2001 | ||
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | FI | 05.09.2001 | |
PT | 05.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 05.09.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH03188195 ; | [X]EP0638637 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,7,11 * example II; claim - *; | [X]EP0651048 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-6,9-16,23,27 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]EP0698660 (KAO CORP [JP])[A] 1-4,9,10,17; | [X]WO9605807 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 39, Database accession no. 91-284833, XP002037416 & JPH03188195 A 19910816 (LION CORP) [X] 1,2,4-9,17 * abstract * |