EP0897313 - IMPROVED HOCKEY STICK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howgate, Ian Robert Malcolm 9 Acomb Crescent, Charlton Kings Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL52 6YH / GB | [1999/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/36] |
Former [1999/08] | Newell, William Joseph Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97920821.2 | 02.05.1997 | [1999/08] | WO1997GB01212 | Priority number, date | GB19960009432 | 04.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9609432 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9741929 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0897313 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897313 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A63B59/12 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
A63B59/70 (EP,US);
A63B2102/22 (EP,US);
A63B2209/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [2003/19] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | HOCKEYSCHLÄGER | [1999/08] | English: | IMPROVED HOCKEY STICK | [1999/08] | French: | CROSSE DE HOCKEY AMELIOREE | [1999/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2003 | CH | 16.07.2003 | FR | 16.07.2003 | IT | 16.07.2003 | LI | 16.07.2003 | NL | 16.07.2003 | DK | 16.10.2003 | ES | 16.12.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FR | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
ES | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
ES | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 16.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB935442 (SAMS BROTHERS LTD) [X] 1,3 * figure - *[A] 25; | [DX]GB2115296 (GRAYS OF CAMBRIDGE LTD) [DX] 1-3,10,11,25 * page 2, line 25 - line 93; figure - *; | [X]WO8809687 (AGENCES IND ET REPRESENTATIONS [FR]) [X] 1-3,14,15,25 * figure - *; | [DXA]GB2205757 (CONLON MARTIN NOEL) [DX] 1-3,10,14,15,25 * the whole document * [A] 11 |