EP0900149 - DECALCOMANIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tullis Russell Brittains Decalcomania Papers Limited Ivy House Paper Mills, Commercial Road Hanley Stoke on Trent ST1 3QS / GB | For all designated states Grand Premier Limited Unit 12, Far Green Industrial Estate, Chell Street Hanley, Stoke on Trent ST1 6AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states Tullis Russell Brittains Decalcomania Papers Limited Ivy House Paper Mills, Commercial Road Hanley, Stoke on Trent ST1 3QS / GB | ||
For all designated states Grand Premier Limited Unit 12, Far Green Industrial Estate, Chell Street Hanley, Stoke on Trent ST1 6AZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Michael, James 10 Woodbridge Road, Clayton, Newcastle Staffordshire ST5 4LA / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Lezlie 14 Holden Avenue S., Sneyd Green, Stoke on Trent Staffordshire ST6 3RG / GB | 03 /
QUINN, Howard, Anthony Brookfield, St. Anne's Vale Brown Edge, Stoke on Trent ST6 8TA / GB | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97920832.9 | 02.05.1997 | [1999/10] | WO1997GB01224 | Priority number, date | GB19960009443 | 04.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9609443 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742040 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900149 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/165, B41M3/12 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
B44C1/165 (EP);
B41M5/0256 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT [1999/10] | Title | German: | ABZIEHBILD | [1999/10] | English: | DECALCOMANIA | [1999/10] | French: | DECALCOMANIE | [1999/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 25.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/28] | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9506564 (REXHAM GRAPHICS INCORPORATED) [X] 1-7,10 * page 3, line 4 - page 14, line 17 * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]FR2715607 (J-P ROUSSELET) [X] 1-7,10 * page 2, line 7 - page 6, line 18 * [Y] 8,9; | [X]GB2281535 (IMAGE DATABASE TECHNOLOGIES (PROPRIETARY) LIMITED) [X] 1-7,10 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 3 *; | [X]FR2678552 (R. BESSO ET AL) [X] 1-7,10 * page 9, line 1 - page 13, line 6 *; | [X]WO9606729 (SAWGRASS SYSTEMS INC.) [X] 1-7,10 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 4 *; | [Y]EP0087285 (MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY) [Y] 8 * page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 31 *; | [Y]US4211810 (F. BARTA) [Y] 8 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 45 *; | [Y]DE9404567U (LEONHARD KURZ GMBH & CO.) [Y] 9 * page 4, line 17 - page 6, line 19 * * page 17, line 29 - page 17, line 33 *; | [Y]WO9513926 (GUARDIAN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES) [Y] 9 * page 3, line 18 - page 14, line 10 * |