EP0904071 - ORAL REHYDRATION PRODUCT COMPRISING GLUTAMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORBROOK LABORATORIES LIMITED Station Works, Camlough Road Newry BT35 6JP / GB | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATTERSON, Alan 60 Quarry Raod Belfast BT4 2NQ / GB | 02 /
ORR, Neil 23 Wests Road Loughbrickland, Co. Down BT32 3RR / GB | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97920885.7 | 13.05.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997GB01279 | Priority number, date | GB19960009993 | 14.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9609993 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742943 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904071 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904071 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/195, // (A61K31/195, 31:00) | [1999/13] | CPC: |
A23L2/38 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP);
A23L33/175 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GLUTAMINHALTIGES ORALES REHYDRATIONSPRODUKT | [1999/13] | English: | ORAL REHYDRATION PRODUCT COMPRISING GLUTAMINE | [1999/13] | French: | PRODUIT POUR REHYDRATATION ORALE CONTENANT DE LA GLUTAMINE | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 02.09.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 13.05.2001 | SE | 14.05.2001 | [2002/20] |
Former [2002/15] | FI | 13.05.2001 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9210175 (TORRE A FARMACEUTICI [IT]) [Y] 1-19 * page 1, line 120; claim 1 *; | [DY]WO9325214 (NORBROOK LAB LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5288703 (WILMORE DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, lines 1-10 * [Y] 1-19; | [Y]JPH06209719 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-19 * abstract *; | [PXY]US5561111 (GUERRANT RICHARD L [US], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document *[PY] 1-19; | [XY] - SCHMIDL M K AND LABUZA T P, "MEDICAL FOODS", FOOD TECHNOLOGY, USA, vol. 46, no. 4, pages 87 - 96, XP002039690 [X] 1 * page 90, column R, line 35 - page 91, column L, line 15 * [Y] 2-19 |