EP0852015 - BATTERY CAPACITY MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emerson Energy Systems AB 141 82 Stockholm / SE | [2001/15] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISTRAND, Per Storängsstigen 11 S-182 74 Stocksund / SE | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm, et al Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/28] | Holmgren, Hans Gunnar, et al Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ), Patent and Trademark Department 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97921070.5 | 29.04.1997 | [1998/28] | WO1997SE00723 | Priority number, date | SE19960001639 | 29.04.1996 Original published format: SE 9601639 | [1998/28] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741448 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852015 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
G01R31/3648 (EP,US);
G01R31/3842 (EP,US);
G01R31/396 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [1998/28] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER KAPAZITÄT EINER BATTERIE | [1998/28] | English: | BATTERY CAPACITY MEASURING DEVICE | [1998/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE LA CAPACITE D'UNE BATTERIE | [1998/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1997 | Translation filed | 19.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 20.06.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9006522 (GLOBE UNION INC [US]); | [X]WO9108494 (OPALPORT ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) |