EP0925336 - MODIFIED ROSIN EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY 2 Manhattanville Road Purchase New York 10577-2196 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY 2 Manhattanville Road Purchase, New York 10577-2196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yan, C. R.R. 1, Cooper Lane, Box 328 Campbell Hall, NY 10916 / US | 02 /
LYNE, M., Bruce 44 Hickory Hill Drive Warwick, NY 10990 / US | 03 /
STARK, John, H. R.R. 2, Box 141 Campbell Hall, NY 10916 / US | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Wiklund, Erik, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [1999/26] | Application number, filing date | 97921453.3 | 29.04.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997US07211 | Priority number, date | US19960639399 | 29.04.1996 Original published format: US 639399 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741186 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925336 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925336 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09F1/00, C09F1/04, D21H11/00, C08J3/02, C08J3/03, C08L93/04, D21H21/16 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C08J3/03 (EP,US);
C08L93/04 (EP,US);
D21H21/16 (EP,US);
C08J2393/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (EP,US);
D21H17/28 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L93/04, C08L23/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/26] | C09F1/00, C09F1/04, D21H11/00, C08J3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, SE [1999/26] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE KOLOPHONIUMEMULSION | [1999/26] | English: | MODIFIED ROSIN EMULSION | [1999/26] | French: | EMULSION DE COLOPHANE MODIFIEE | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 25.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 14.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03174092 ; | [A]JPH04222295 ; | [X]US4714727 (HUME III ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1-38 * claims 4,5,13 * * column 4, lines 4,5,7 *; | [A]US4943608 (TAKAHASHI MIZUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-38* claim 1 *; | [X]EP0487497 (PATRIA PAPIER & ZELLSTOFF [AT]) [X] 1-38 * page 1, lines 11-13 * * page 3, lines 20,21,37-39 * * page 4, lines 7,8,21,22 * * claims 1,3,4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911025), vol. 015, no. 421, Database accession no. (C - 0878), & JP03174092 A 19910729 (DIC HERCULES CHEM INC) [X] 1-38 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921208), vol. 016, no. 566, Database accession no. (C - 1009), & JP04222295 A 19920812 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-38 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4276111 (KARIM KHALID A, et al); | [Y]US4714728 (GRAHAM STEPHEN L [US], et al); | [Y]US4743303 (HELMER ULLA [SE], et al); | [YP]US5571379 (DERRICK ARTHUR P [AU]) |