EP0904162 - CONTINUOUS BELT DRILLING MUD SEPARATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Williams, J., Terrell P.O. Box 1973 Lake Charles, LA 70602 / US | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Powell, Timothy John, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Powell, Timothy John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97921468.1 | 01.05.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997US07312 | Priority number, date | US19960016863P | 06.05.1996 Original published format: US 16863 P | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741972 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904162 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904162 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/10 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
B07B1/50 (EP,US);
B01D33/04 (EP,US);
B01D33/056 (EP,US);
B01D33/275 (EP,US);
B01D33/465 (EP,US);
B01D33/466 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [1999/13] | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHES FLIESSBANDSYSTEM ZUM ABSCHEIDEN VON BOHRABFÄLLEN | [1999/13] | English: | CONTINUOUS BELT DRILLING MUD SEPARATION SYSTEM | [1999/13] | French: | SYSTEME A COURROIE CONTINUE DE SEPARATION DE LA BOUE DE FORAGE | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 24.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 25.02.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4079010 (KILLEEN WALTER H, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 19 ** figure - *; | [X]WO9312321 (WOODBURN WILLIAM [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 22 - page 6, line 20 * * figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US3631980 (HAMACHEK FRANK B); | [X]US4146483 (LEE JOSEPH E) |