EP0906241 - A STRADDLE CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schults, Tommy 11 Tracey Street Kenmore, QLD 4069 / AU | [1999/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Willquist, Bo Willquist & Partners Patentbyra AB, S:t Larsgatan 23 582 24 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 97921539.9 | 23.05.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997AU00323 | Priority number, date | AU1996PO00513 | 18.06.1996 Original published format: AU PO051396 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9748636 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906241 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0906241 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/06, B60P1/02, B60P3/40, B66C19/00, B65D90/14 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
B65D90/146 (EP);
B66C19/007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/14] | B66F9/06, B60P1/02, B60P3/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/14] | Title | German: | PORTALHUBWAGEN | [1999/14] | English: | A STRADDLE CARRIER | [1999/14] | French: | CHARIOT ENJAMBEUR | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 14.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 14.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2004 | BE | 18.08.2004 | CH | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | LI | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | SE | 18.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2018423 (MASCH GLUCKAUF) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 6-9; | [A]FR2067895 (SARAZIN JEAN) [A] 10* page 4, lines 15-31 *; | [XY]FR2244699 (BEYER ETUDES GERARD [FR]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4-9,11; | [Y]GB2084110 (WOUDE EELKE V D) [Y] 4-9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4546891 (LANIGAN SR JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * column 5, lines 28-59 * | International search | [Y]SU1527035 ; | [Y]US3156484 (HUGHES TALBERT ELMER); | [Y]US3497231 (FULMER GEORGE M, et al); | [Y]DE2437208 (MANNESMANN AG); | [X]US4746260 (NORVELL DON [US]); | [Y]NL8802239 (ALUMINIUM EN ROESTVASTSTAAL CT); | [X]EP0362988 (DANISH CONTAINER SUPPLY [DK]); | [Y]AU6844394 (KRUPP FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH); | [X]DE4126728 (WOETZEL KARL HEINZ [DE], et al); | [X]DE19539914 (NOELL GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE4440180 (KRESS WALTER [DE]) | [Y] - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. 90-199958/26, Class Q15, Q22; & SU,A,1 527 035 (VORON POLY), 7 December 1989., & SU1527035 A 00000000 |