EP0894019 - ACOUSTIC THERAPY DEVICE WITH A SOURCE OF THERAPEUTIC ACOUSTIC WAVES AND AN ULTRASOUND LOCATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄTZLE, Ulrich Schulstrasse 26 D-91341 Röttenbach / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Erhard Heuwaagstrasse 20 D-91054 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
THUM, Bernhard Weiherle 12 D-89359 Koetz / DE | [1999/05] | Application number, filing date | 97921592.8 | 27.03.1997 | [1999/05] | WO1997DE00632 | Priority number, date | DE1996113243 | 02.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19613243 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736650 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894019 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894019 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/02, A61B8/12 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/445 (EP,US);
A61B8/4461 (EP,US);
A61N7/022 (EP,US);
A61B17/22004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00274 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00973 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22028 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/05] | Title | German: | AKUSTISCHES THERAPIEGERÄT AUFWEISEND EINE QUELLE THERAPEUTISCHER AKUSTISCHER WELLEN UND EINE ULTRASCHALL-ORTUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [1999/05] | English: | ACOUSTIC THERAPY DEVICE WITH A SOURCE OF THERAPEUTIC ACOUSTIC WAVES AND AN ULTRASOUND LOCATION SYSTEM | [1999/05] | French: | APPAREIL THERAPEUTIQUE ACOUSTIQUE PRESENTANT UNE SOURCE D'ONDES ACOUSTIQUES THERAPEUTIQUES ET UN DISPOSITIF DE LOCALISATION A ULTRASONS | [1999/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 13.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9316641 (DIASONICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9502994 (INNELECT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 16, line 10 - line 16 * * page 20, line 18 - line 33 *; | [A]WO9519143 (PAUL G YOCK AND ROBERT J SIEGE [US]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 15 - line 22 * * page 9, line 9 - line 12 ** page 22, line 7 - line 11 *; | [A]EP0668052 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 2; figure 3 * |