EP0894064 - TRANSPORT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUTTO, Uwe Boelkestrasse 19 79100 Freiburg / DE | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Günter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. G. Zimmermann Gerberau 9a 79098 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Zimmermann, Günter, Dr. Kanalstrasse 6 79106 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97921615.7 | 16.04.1997 | [1999/05] | WO1997DE00766 | Priority number, date | DE1996115138 | 17.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19615138 | DE1996115139 | 17.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19615139 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9738892 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894064 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894064 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62J9/00 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
B62J7/04 (EP);
B62J7/08 (EP);
B62J9/23 (EP);
B62J9/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, NL [1999/05] | Title | German: | TRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG | [1999/05] | English: | TRANSPORT DEVICE | [1999/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT | [1999/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE474410 (GEORG BOPP DIPL ING) [X] 1-5,12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 6-11; | [Y]DE9215430U (SCI-CON) [Y] 6,8 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 15; figure - *; | [Y]EP0530403 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [Y] 11 * column 7, line 22 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE9307276U (H. HEMMELSKAMP GMBH) [Y] 7,9,10 * page 4, line 16 - line 24; figure - *; | [AD]DE4422772 (HUETTNER ALFRED [DE]) [AD] 1* figure -; claim 1 * | by applicant | GB2047644 | DE4422772 |