EP0837911 - PLATE-LIKE TITANIUM DIOXIDE PIGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDES, Stephanie Klosterhofstrasse 25 D-63477 Maintal 3 / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Gerd Barbarastrasse 12b D-63801 Kleinostheim / DE | 03 /
BRENNER, Günter Jahnstrasse 37a D-64347 Griesheim / DE | 04 /
BRÜCKNER, Dieter Siemensstrasse 10 D-64289 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
HEYLAND, Andrea Talstrasse 25 D-64385 Ober-Kainsbach / DE | 06 /
KUNTZ, Matthias Im Berggarten 16 D-64342 Seeheim / DE | 07 /
OSTERRIED, Karl Messeler Weg 20 B D-64807 Dieburg / DE | 08 /
PFAFF, Gerhard Trautenauer Strasse 41 D-64839 Münster / DE | 09 /
SCHMELZ, Michael Königsberger Strasse 51 D-65830 Kriftel / DE | [1998/18] | Application number, filing date | 97921766.8 | 25.04.1997 | [1998/18] | WO1997EP02132 | Priority number, date | DE1996118564 | 09.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19618564 | [1998/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743346 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837911 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837911 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C09C1/36, C09D7/12, C09D11/00, C08K3/00, A61K7/00, C04B33/14, A61K7/42, A23L1/275 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
C09C1/0021 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/0018 (EP,KR,US);
A23L5/42 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/037 (EP,US);
C09D5/36 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/405 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/43 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/20 (KR,US);
C09C2200/1004 (EP,KR,US);
C09C2200/301 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [1998/18] | Title | German: | PLÄTTCHENFÖRMIGES TITANDIOXIDPIGMENT | [1998/18] | English: | PLATE-LIKE TITANIUM DIOXIDE PIGMENT | [1998/18] | French: | PIGMENT DE DIOXYDE DE TITANE SOUS FORME DE PLAQUETTES | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.10.2001 | FR | 17.10.2001 | GB | 17.10.2001 | IT | 17.10.2001 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 17.10.2001 | |
FR | 17.10.2001 | ||
GB | 17.10.2001 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 17.10.2001 | |
GB | 17.10.2001 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | FI | 17.10.2001 | |
GB | 17.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 17.10.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01264932 ; | [A]US3340006 (MOCHEL JOHN M) [A] 1,3 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3395203 (YOSHIO MORITA) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US3582382 (WATANABE AKIRA, et al) [A] 5 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0649816 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP]) [A] 1,3,6-8 * claims 6,9,12,20,22 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 48, Database accession no. 89-353145, XP002035808 & JPH01264932 A 19891023 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA) [A] 1 * abstract * |