|
08.01.2010 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
16.03.2009 |
F3033.1 Forwarding decision correcting errors to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.03.2009 |
F3033.1 Forwarding decision correcting errors to the parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
06.10.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Description |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2005 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.07.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2001 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
40 |