EP0913191 - MICROEMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAHAMA, Tohru Taisho Phar. Co., Ltd., 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | 02 /
HASEGAWA, Kazuo Taisho Phar. Co., Ltd., 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | 03 /
NAKAJIMA, Toshiaki Taisho Phar. Co., Ltd., 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Yuji Taisho Phar. Co., Ltd., 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/18] | Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97922149.6 | 23.05.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997JP01736 | Priority number, date | JP19960128110 | 23.05.1996 Original published format: JP 12811096 | [1999/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9744124 | Date: | 27.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0913191 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/00, B01F17/00, A61K7/00 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
B01J13/00 (EP,US);
C09K23/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/18] | B01J13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | MIKROEMULSION | [1999/18] | English: | MICROEMULSION | [1999/18] | French: | MICROEMULSION | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1998 | Translation filed | 23.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 15.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/05] | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH0451853 (HASEGAWA T CO LTD); | [X]JPH07227227 (SAN EI GEN FFI INC) |