EP0903938 - PROGRAM GUIDE DISPLAYING AND CONTROL DEVICE AND TELEVISION RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKISAKA, Masako 3-1-2-1015, Kamishinjyo, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 533 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Akihiko 10-15, Hinomine 1-chome, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-12 / JP | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97922185.0 | 26.05.1997 | [1999/12] | WO1997JP01777 | Priority number, date | JP19960138323 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13832396 | [1999/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746011 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0903938 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903938 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/12] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG UND DARSTELLUNG EINER PROGRAMMÜBERSICHT SOWIE FERNSEHEMPFÄNGER | [1999/12] | English: | PROGRAM GUIDE DISPLAYING AND CONTROL DEVICE AND TELEVISION RECEIVER | [1999/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET D'AFFICHAGE DE GUIDES DE PROGRAMMES ET RECEPTEUR DE TELEVISION | [1999/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1998 | Translation filed | 23.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 17.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9528799 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 22, line 18 - line 25 * * page 25, line 12 - page 26, line 6 * * page 29, line 14 - line 23 ** page 32, line 4 - line 8; figure 11 * | International search | [A]JPH05284480 ; | [A]JPH05284479 ; | [A]JPH06245161 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [A]JPH07184136 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH07236099 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH07284035 (TOSHIBA CORP) | Examination | US5353121 |