EP0900182 - METHODS FOR INHIBITING THE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BetzDearborn Inc 4636 Somerton Road Trevose, PA 19053-6783 / US | [1999/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARHANCET, Graciela, B. 20667 Castle Bend Drive Katy, TX 77459 / US | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 97922300.5 | 04.04.1997 | [1999/10] | WO1997US06099 | Priority number, date | US19960642836 | 03.05.1996 Original published format: US 642836 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742146 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900182 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900182 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C7/20, C07C11/18, C07C69/618, C07C57/44 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
C07C7/20 (EP,US);
C09K15/06 (EP,US);
C09K15/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C7/20, C07C11/167 (US,EP);
C07C7/20, C07C11/18 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1999/10] | C07C7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1999/10] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR INHIBIERUNG DER POLYMERISATION VON ETHYLENISCHE UNGESATTIGTEN MONOMEREN | [1999/10] | English: | METHODS FOR INHIBITING THE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS | [1999/10] | French: | PROCEDES DESTINES A EMPECHER LA POLYMERISATION DE MONOMERES ALCENIQUES | [1999/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 04.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.05.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 20.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5221498 (REID DWIGHT K [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * claims 1,5 *; | [AD]JPS5915477 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840509), vol. 008, no. 098, Database accession no. (C - 221), & JP59015477 A 19840126 (TANABE SEIYAKU KK) [AD] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4725638 (ELLMANN EVA [IL], et al); | US5416258 [ ] (ARHANCET GRACIELA B [US], et al); | US5396005 [ ] (ARHANCET GRACIELA B [US]); | [A]US3775493 (DE SIMONE R, et al) |