EP0895635 - OPTICAL FLYING HEAD WITH SOLID IMMERSION LENS HAVING RAISED CENTRAL SURFACE FACING MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digital Papyrus Technologies 100 Kuniholm Drive Holliston, MA 01746 / US | [1999/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Neville, K., S. Hong Kong University of Science and Technnoloy Dept. of IEEM Hong Kong / HK | 02 /
BERG, John, S. 175 Blackstone Street Bellingham, MA 02019 / US | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97922442.5 | 25.04.1997 | [1999/06] | WO1997US06902 | Priority number, date | US19960638349 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: US 638349 | [1999/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9741556 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895635 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12 | [1999/06] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/122 (EP,US);
G11B7/1374 (EP,US);
G11B7/1387 (EP,US);
G11B7/22 (EP,US);
G11B2007/13727 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/06] | Title | German: | FLIEGENDER OPTISCHER ABTASTKOPF MIT FESTKÖRPERIMMERSIONSLINSE, DIE EINE DEM AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER ZUGEWANDTE ERHABENE ZENTRALE FLÄCHE AUFWEIST | [1999/06] | English: | OPTICAL FLYING HEAD WITH SOLID IMMERSION LENS HAVING RAISED CENTRAL SURFACE FACING MEDIA | [1999/06] | French: | TETE OPTIQUE FLOTTANTE MUNIE D'UNE LENTILLE A IMMERSION MASSIVE DONT LA ZONE CENTRALE FACE AU SUPPORT EST SURELEVEE | [1999/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/17] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07254185 ; | [A]US4803337 (ISHIKAWA REIJI [JP], et al) [A] 21* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0309947 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 21 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0363966 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-6,10,12 * page 9, line 58; figures 2,3,9; claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0405742 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1,7 * figure 5; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0409468 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 5; claim 1 *; | [X]US5125750 (CORLE TIMOTHY R [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 4,5B,6; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0549236 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,7 * figures 3,4; claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0594193 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0639830 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, lines 22-31 * * column 8, lines 7-18; figure 3 *; | [X]US5497359 (MAMIN HARRY J [US], et al) [X] 1,12-15,24,25 * the whole document *; | [X] - "Slider mounted solid immersion lens for optical storage", IBM TDB, ARMONK NY US, (1993), vol. 38, no. 12, page 51, XP002036756 [X] 1,13-15 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, & JP07254185 A 19951003 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - "Use of Diamond-Like Carbon Thin-Film on a Silicon/Heat Sink", IBM TDB, ARMONK NY US, (199410), vol. 37, no. 10, page 501, XP000475753 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - MANSFIELD S M, "High-numerical aperture lens system for optical storage", OPTIC LETTERS, USA, (19930215), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 305 - 307, XP000339186 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |